+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died on third reading file.
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 43. Noes 16. Page 3362.)
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 50. Noes 17. Page 1953.)
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 46. Noes 20. Page 1907.).
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Levine.
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 1907.)
- Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Page 1688.)
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1690.)
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (April 26).
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and REV. & TAX.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (6)
January 24, 2022: AB 1223 Levine Third Reading Urgency Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 17
June 10, 2021: AB 1223 Levine Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 12
June 3, 2021: AB 1223 Levine Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 13
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 26, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor