+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled measure version corrected.
On June 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1819.).
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1480.)
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 27, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1220 Cristina Garcia By Bradford
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 12, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2019: AB 1220 Cristina Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
April 24, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor