+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 19. Page 2639.).
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 2218.).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 2. Page 1722.) (June 29).
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 11. Page 1150.)
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 14).
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (March 22).
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On December 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
On December 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 1, 2021: AB 122 Boerner Horvath Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 11
August 30, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB122 Boerner Horvath et a By Wiener
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
June 29, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2021: AB 122 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 15
April 14, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor