+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 645.)
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.)
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.)
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
- Read first time.
On January 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
March 23, 2015: AB 122 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget
Type:
Primary Sponsor