+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (36)
On October 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 619, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3302.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2705.).
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On August 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2230.).
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1377.)
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1305.)
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28).
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 13, 2017: AB 1219 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 11, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1219 Eggman et al. By Dodd
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 24, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1219
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 11, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 4, 2017: AB 1219 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
April 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 28, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor