+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 11, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 754, Statutes of 2023.
On September 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3370.).
On September 12, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2628.).
On September 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
On May 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1740.)
On May 11, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 10).
On April 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 12, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 12).
On March 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On February 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
September 13, 2023: AB 1218 Lowenthal Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 12, 2023: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1218 Lowenthal By Skinner
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 10, 2023: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
June 28, 2023: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 3
May 25, 2023: AB 1218 Lowenthal Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 10, 2023: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2023: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
April 12, 2023: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor