+ − Summaries (13)
+ − Full Texts (14)
+ − Actions (52)
On September 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 474, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6883.).
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 28).
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5268.).
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Portantino.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Measure version as amended on July 19 corrected.
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 12).
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1942.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5).
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 29, 2018: AB 1217 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 28, 2018: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 3
August 13, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1217 Santiago By De León
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 12, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
June 28, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2017: AB 1217 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2017: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7