+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1595.)
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
June 15, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 26, 2015: AB 1216 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 26, 2015: AB 1216 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor