+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 22, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor