+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1756.)
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 27).
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2021: AB 1214 Waldron Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
April 27, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1