+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On February 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
- Read first time.
On December 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
On December 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor