+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5251.).
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4295.).
On August 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On January 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3942.)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
On January 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On January 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 27, 2020: AB 1205 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
August 24, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1205 Limón By Caballero
- Yeas: 40
August 10, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
January 30, 2020: AB 1205 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
January 23, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
January 15, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor