+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor