+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 678, Statutes of 2013.
On October 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1980.).
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 12).
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1820.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 26, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1202 Skinner By Monning
- Yeas: 39
August 12, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 26, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2013: AB 1202 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 24, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor