+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 2848.).
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.).
On August 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7).
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 23).
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 14. Page 1149.)
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 7).
On March 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 7, 2021: AB 1200 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 20
September 3, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1200 Ting et al. By Allen
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
July 7, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 23, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
April 22, 2021: AB 1200 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 17
April 7, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor