+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 45, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1632.).
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1334.)
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
- Read first time.
On December 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
On December 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2021: Consent Calendar AB120
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 6, 2021: AB 120 Salas Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
April 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 22
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor