+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 2011.).
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2010.)
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- June 13-Motion to reconsider continued.
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Fong.
- Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1886.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24).
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 23).
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 14, 2013: AB 1199 FONG Motion to Reconsider
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2013: AB 1199 FONG Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 4
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 23, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor