+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On January 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-referral to the Com. on A. & A.R.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 3536.)
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A. & A.R.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
January 14, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor