+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7).
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1127.)
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 22).
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 12, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
July 12, 2017: [First] hearing set for [07-12-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 7
June 7, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 20, 2017: AB 1196 HARPER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
March 22, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1