+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (37)
On September 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 892, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1.).
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 31).
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5059.).
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q., GOV. & F. and N.R. & W.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 1648.)
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.S. & T.M.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2022: AB 1195 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
August 31, 2022: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 7
August 24, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1195 Cristina Garcia By Cortese
- Yeas: 40
June 29, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 27, 2021: AB 1195 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 28, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor