+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 795, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3114.).
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2496.).
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 2039.)
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 1990.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1855.)
- Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1851.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 10).
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced measure version corrected.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2017: AB 1194 DABABNEH Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 9
September 6, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1194 Dababneh et al. By McGuire
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
July 12, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments]
- Yeas: 7
June 1, 2017: AB 1194 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
June 1, 2017: AB 1194 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading Motion to Postpone to a Time Cer By KILEY Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 6
May 10, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 26, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7