+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
April 15, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor