+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor