+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1490.)
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 2).
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28).
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 11, 2017: AB 1185 O'DONNELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 2, 2017: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
March 28, 2017: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor