+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 786, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 2833.).
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2374.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 1556.)
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 13).
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 3, 2015: AB 1185 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 2
September 3, 2015: AB 1185 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 2
September 1, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1185 Ridley-Thomas By Mendoza
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 14
September 1, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1185 Ridley-Thomas By Mendoza
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 14
July 6, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 17, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2015: AB 1185 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 9
May 13, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor