+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 26).
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and ED.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor