+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 441, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 3119.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2241.).
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 1597.).
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 15).
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 23).
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2013: AB 1180 PAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
September 9, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1180 Pan By Monning Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 39
August 30, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 9
May 24, 2013: AB 1180 PAN Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
May 15, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
April 23, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor