+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 27).
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1704.)
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 1571.)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1602.)
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.)
On January 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
On January 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 27, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
May 18, 2017: AB 118 TING Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor