+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 631, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3326.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2403.).
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1661.)
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On January 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
On January 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 12, 2013: AB 118 E.S. & T.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By ALEJO
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
September 12, 2013: Special Consent #10 AB118 Committee on E.S. & T.M.(Alejo) By Monning
- Yeas: 39
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 26, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
June 12, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Health.
- Yeas: 9
May 28, 2013: AB 118 E.S. & T.M. Assembly Third Reading By ALEJO
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
March 12, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (6)
Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials
Type:
Primary Sponsor