+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 694, Statutes of 2021.
On September 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2919.).
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2297.).
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1624.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
- Referred to Com. on E.M.
On December 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
On December 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 8, 2021: AB 118 Kamlager Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BAUER-KAHAN
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
September 1, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB118 Kamlager et al.
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 15, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 6, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2021: AB 118 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading By KALRA
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor