+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 451, Statutes of 2021.
On September 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 3061.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2530.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5).
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 23).
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I., L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 1848.)
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 29).
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2021: AB 1177 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 5
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1177 Santiago et al. By Hueso
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 5, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 23, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 2, 2021: AB 1177 Santiago Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 7
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 29, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor