+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 1623.)
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 13).
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
May 28, 2015: AB 1173 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 3
May 13, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor