+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3354.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3352.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2419.).
- (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 2411.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1704.)
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 12, 2013: W/O REF. TO FILE AB1173 Bocanegra By De León
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
September 12, 2013: AB 1173 BOCANEGRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
August 19, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
August 14, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2013: AB 1173 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
May 13, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor