+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3114.).
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (September 10).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2894.)
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2875.)
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2463.).
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1471.)
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2021: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 3
September 10, 2021: AB 1173 Cooper Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
September 7, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1173 Cooper By Dodd
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 6, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
May 20, 2021: AB 1173 Cooper Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 12, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
April 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 22
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor