+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 193, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1844.).
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and GOV. & F.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1120.)
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17).
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On January 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
On January 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 15, 2013: Consent Calendar 2nd AB117 Cooley
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 7
June 11, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2013: AB 117 COOLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
April 17, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 3, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor