+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 171, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2315.).
On July 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1793.).
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1225.)
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
July 9, 2015: AB 1166 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 6, 2015: Special Consent #4 AB1166 Bloom
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 22, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2015: AB 1166 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 30, 2015: AB 1166 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor