+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 823, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3131.).
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2522.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1987.)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
- Coauthors revised.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2019: AB 1165 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
September 4, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1165 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Skinner
- Yeas: 40
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
July 1, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 18, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 24, 2019: AB 1165 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 9, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor