+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (39)
On September 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 5. Page 7159.).
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 31).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 7122.)
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 5767.).
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1858.)
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
August 31, 2018: AB 1165 Caballero Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 10
August 31, 2018: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 10
August 27, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1165 Caballero By Wilk
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
August 16, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
July 5, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2017: AB 1165 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 24, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
May 8, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor