+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 822, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2891.).
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2243.).
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1).
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1771.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2019: AB 1164 Gloria Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 22, 2019: Special Consent AB1164
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 11, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: AB 1164 Gloria Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
May 8, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
May 8, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 18
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor