+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 140, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4192.).
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 3723.)
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From consent calendar.
- Ordered to third reading.
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23).
On January 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 30, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1163 Levine By Lieu
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 9, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
January 29, 2014: AB 1163 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
January 23, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
January 8, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor