+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1487.)
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
June 29, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 18, 2015: AB 1153 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 13, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 29, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor