+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on inactive file.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
On August 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 23).
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 3686.)
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 23, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 27, 2014: AB 1153 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
January 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
January 14, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor