+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 111, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1756.).
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1349.)
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
July 2, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1148 Beth Gaines
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
June 16, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 7, 2015: AB 1148 GAINES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 7, 2015: AB 1148 GAINES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor