+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 2744.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2310.).
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and TRANS.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 1684.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
- Coauthors revised.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
September 2, 2021: AB 1147 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 5
September 1, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1147 Friedman et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 13, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
July 1, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 28, 2021: AB 1147 Friedman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 14, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
April 5, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor