+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 221, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2418.).
On July 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1902.).
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1216.)
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 16, 2015: AB 1146 JONES Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
July 13, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1146 Jones By Anderson
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2015: AB 1146 JONES Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10