+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor