+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 4. Page 5371.).
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 5371.)
On September 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gallagher.
- Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 12. Page 3616.)
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 2895.).
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9).
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 6. Page 1853.)
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1614.)
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 1614.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider on the next legislative day made by Assembly Member Gallagher.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 1594.).
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 14, 2019: AB 1138 Gallagher Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 30
September 12, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1138 Gallagher et al. By Stern
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
July 9, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2019: AB 1138 Gallagher Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 45
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1