+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2743.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.)
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2306.).
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1225.)
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 1, 2015: AB 1130 GRAY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 31, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1130 Gray By Pan
- Yeas: 40
June 24, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2015: AB 1130 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 30, 2015: AB 1130 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor