+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On March 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4144.).
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 17).
On March 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. by unanimous consent.
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 10).
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4028.)
- Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2858.).
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (February 24).
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 12).
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1816.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
March 20, 2014: AB 1124 MURATSUCHI Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
March 10, 2014: Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 5
March 3, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1124 Muratsuchi By Hernandez Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 8
February 24, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 12, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 30, 2013: AB 1124 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 16, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
April 2, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor