+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2624.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2619.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2619.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2051.).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (July 10).
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1988.)
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1183.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.)
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 11, 2019: AB 111 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
July 11, 2019: Assembly 2nd Reading AB111 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
July 10, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
April 11, 2019: AB 111 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor